SB326
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Raggio

Revises provisions governing the system of public education in this State. (BDR 34-13)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 19, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)