SB327
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Provides incentives for certain electrification projects. (BDR S-377)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 16, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.237   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 237.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)