SB330
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford

Enacts the Initiative for a World-Class Education in Nevada. (BDR 34-171)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 18, 2009     11:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 24, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 01, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May. 04, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May. 31, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.450     Amend. No.976   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 450.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 976.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)