SB331
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 19, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Provides a partial abatement of property taxes and certain sales and use taxes imposed on facilities that use solar or wind energy to generate electricity or process heat. (BDR 58-289)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 05, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.415   

Bill History

Mar 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 415.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)