SB332
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 19, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Revises provisions governing the use and taxation of certain fuels. (BDR 43-1147)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 23, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 23, 2009     12:03 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.472     Amend. No.745     Amend. No.CA16   

Bill History

Mar 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 472.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 745 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 745 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 29, 2009

  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 745 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 464.
  • Sections 14 to 47, inclusive, subsection 1 of section 48 and 49 effective June 4, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and January 1, 2010, for all other purposes. Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, and subsection 2 of section 48 effective July 1, 2009.