AB487
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing pupils enrolled in middle school and junior high school. (BDR 34-780)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 311.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 20, 2009     12:01 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Apr. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 14   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.222     Amend. No.738   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 222.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 738 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 311.
  • Sections 7 and 8 of this act effective July 1, 2009. Sections 2 to 6, inclusive, of this act effective July 1, 2009, for the purpose of adopting the policies required by sections 2, 3, 5 and 6 of this act and July 1, 2011, for all other purposes.