SCR19
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study relating to the production and use of energy in the State. (BDR R-1235)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 99.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and be adopted as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 28, 2009     01:50 PM    Minutes          Be adopted
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 31, 2009     10:45 PM    Minutes          Be adopted

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Be adopted.
  • Placed on Resolution File.
  • Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Be adopted.
  • Placed on Resolution File.
  • Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 99.