SB340
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing the allocation of certain money from the Fund for a Healthy Nevada. (BDR 40-1133)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 226.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 07, 2009     05:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 12, 2009     07:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.262   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 262.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 226.
  • Effective July 1, 2010.