AB491
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes concerning the execution on property of a judgment debtor or defendant. (BDR 2-948)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 13, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May. 14, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.336     Amend. No.727   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 336.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 727.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 21, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 727 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)