AB492
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Government Affairs

Imposes certain requirements on the enactment of legislation and the provision of notice regarding certain tax abatements and exemptions. (BDR 32-602)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 30, 2009     04:40 PM    Minutes          Recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.481     Amend. No.822   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 481.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 22, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 822 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 30, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 822 receded from.
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • To printer.

May 31, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.