AB501
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing mechanics' and materialmen's liens. (BDR 9-1159)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 30, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 30, 2009     12:48 PM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)