AB504
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Transportation

Adds provisions relating to exchange and reporting of information relating to motor vehicle insurance. (BDR 43-461)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 23, 2009     11:45 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.377   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 377.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)