SB350
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to business. (BDR 7-1118)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 361.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 31, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 23, 2009     11:15 AM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.240     Amend. No.749   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 240.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 749.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 23, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 749 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 361.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.