SB354
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing land use planning. (BDR 22-235)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 30, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 14, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 38,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.311     Amend. No.857     Amend. No.938   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 311.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 857.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)