SB358
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Revises provisions related to energy. (BDR 58-1146)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 31, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 17, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 05, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 21, 2009     12:00 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.387     Amend. No.666     Amend. No.851     Amend. No.894   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 387.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 666.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 894.) To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.
  • Sections 1 to 1.51, inclusive, 1.55 to 19.7, inclusive, 19.9 to 20.9, inclusive, and 21 effective May 28, 2009. Sections 1.51, 1.85, 1.87, 1.92, 1.93, 1.95, 4.3 to 9, inclusive, and 19.4 expire by limitation June 30, 2011. Sections 1.53 and 19.8 effective July 1, 2011.