AB505
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools and pupils enrolled in high school. (BDR 34-784)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 23, 2009     11:47 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar. 25, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Education     Apr. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     06:50 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 15   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 18,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.223     Amend. No.669     Amend. No.962     Amend. No.1015     Amend. No.1011   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 223.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 669.) To printer.

May 14, 2009

May 15, 2009

May 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 962.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 1011 and 1015.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Not voting: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint . To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)