AB511
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises industrial insurance provisions relating to insurers and third-party administrators. (BDR 53-115)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     11:54 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 14   Yea 29,   Nay 12,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)