AB512
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to security deposits for the rental of real property. (BDR 10-921)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     11:54 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.103   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 103.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.