AB515
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes relating to the provision of and reimbursement for certain services to assist families. (BDR 57-1175)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.444   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 444.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)