AB519
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments

Creates a statutory commission to review continuation of state agencies, boards and commissions and tax exemptions, abatements and earmarked revenue sources. (BDR 17-1165)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 23, 2009     11:45 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 07, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)