SB363
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to death benefits paid to surviving spouses under industrial insurance. (BDR 53-1130)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 503.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.290   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 290.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 503.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.