AB81
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises various provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-406)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 501.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 01, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 310     Amend. No. 545   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 685   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 310 and 545.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 685.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 685 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 685 receded from.
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 501.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.