AB118
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Stewart

Requires an animal abuser to register with the sheriff of the county in which he or she resides under certain circumstances. (BDR 50-751)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 03, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 04, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)