SB170
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford, Oceguera

Revises provisions governing petitions for initiative or referendum. (BDR 24-537)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 22, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 10, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 12, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 512   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 512.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)