AB229
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 02, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera, Bobzien, Smith, Horne, Conklin, Anderson, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Daly, Dondero Loop, Flores, Kirkpatrick, Mastroluca, Munford, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Segerblom

Revises provisions governing the accountability and performance of public schools and educational personnel. (BDR 34-515)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 379.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 02, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     Mar 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Mar 25, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 03, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     May 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 18, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     May 20, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Education     Jun 03, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 11, 2011   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 111     Amend. No. 861   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 03, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 08, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 111.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2011

Apr 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

Jun 01, 2011

  • To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 861 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 379.
  • Sections 1 to 7, inclusive, 9 to 13, inclusive, 15, 17, 18, 19, 19.6, 19.7, 19.8, 21, 22, and 23 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 8, 14, 16, 19.5, and 20 of this act effective July 1, 2013. Section 20.5 of this act effective July 1, 2013, if, and only if, Assembly Bill No. 225 of the 76th Session is enacted by the Legislature and becomes effective.