AB273
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 3-561)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 311.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 23, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 489     Amend. No. 679     Amend. No. 824   

Bill History

Mar 15, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 489.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 679.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 824.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 679 and 824 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 311.
  • The amendatory provisions of sections 1 to 3, inclusive, of this act apply only to an obligation secured by a mortgage, deed of trust, or other encumbrance upon real property on or after the effective date of this act. Sections 3.3 and 5.7 of this act apply only to an action commenced after a foreclosure sale or sale in lieu of a foreclosure sale that occurs on or after July 1, 2011. Section 5.5 of this act applies only to an action against a guarantor, surety, or other obligor commenced on or after the effective date of this act. Sections 1 to 3, inclusive, 5, 5.5, 5.8 to 6, inclusive, and 7 of this act effective June 10, 2011. Sections 3.3 and 5.7 of this act effective July 1, 2011.