AB373
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea

Prohibits the destruction of real property that is subject to foreclosure with the intent to defraud. (BDR 15-98)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 08, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 457   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 457.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.