SB405
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing business entities. (BDR 7-528)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 455.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 05, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 12, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 226   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 29, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 226.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 455.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.