Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

 

Economic Forum

The Economic Forum was created by the Legislature during the 1993 Legislative Session (NRS 353.226-229). The Economic Forum is responsible for providing forecasts of the state's General Fund revenues for each biennium budget period. By statute, the Economic Forum is required to provide forecasts on or before December 3 of even-numbered years and on or before May 1 of odd-numbered years. The December 3 estimates are used by the Governor in preparing budget recommendations presented to the Legislature in January of odd-numbered years. The May 1 forecast is the final official revenue estimate that is used by the Legislature in balancing General Fund appropriations with projected General Fund revenues for each biennial budget period. 

Assembly Bill 332, approved during the 2011 Legislative Session, requires the Economic Forum to meet on or before June 10 of each even-numbered year, and December 10 of each odd-numbered year. At each of these meetings, the Economic Forum receives an update on the status of actual State General Fund revenue collections compared to the Economic Forum's most recent forecast. The provisions of A.B. 332 are not intended to authorize the Economic Forum to make additional forecasts of State General Fund revenue at these meetings. The Economic Forum also considers information on current economic indicators, such as employment, unemployment, personal income and any other indicators deemed appropriate by the Economic Forum. The Chair of the Economic Forum is required to provide a report of each of these two additional meetings to the Interim Finance Committee and the information presented to Interim Finance Committee must be made available on the website of the Legislature.

This link provides additional background on the Economic Forum.

The Economic Forum consists of five appointed members who cannot be employees of state government, including publicly supported institutions of higher education. The Governor appoints all five members to the Economic Forum, with the Senate Majority Leader and the Speaker of the Assembly each nominating one member for appointment. Each member appointed to the Economic Forum serves a two-year term.

The current members are:

Marvin Leavitt, Speaker of the Assembly Appointment
Matthew Maddox, Governor Appointment
Jennifer Lewis, Senate Majority Leader Appointment
Linda Rosenthal, Governor Appointment
Ken Wiles, Governor Appointment

 

Click here for information on agendas and minutes of Economic Forum meetings.

 


ECONOMIC FORUM FORECAST REPORTS

  These reports are in Adobe PDF format. You will need the Acrobat Reader to view these files.

 

May 1, 2013, Forecast Report – Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2012-13, and fiscal year 2013-14, and fiscal year 2014-15 for the 2013-15 biennium.

 

November 30, 2012, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2012-13, fiscal year 2013-14, and fiscal year 2014-15 for the 2013-15 biennium.

 

 

 

May 2, 2011, Forecast Report – Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2010-11, and fiscal year 2011-12 and fiscal year 2012-13 for the 2011-2013 biennium. Forecast Comparison

 

May 2, 2011, Forecast Report Adjusted for Legislative Actions from the 2011 Session – Economic Forum's May 2, 2011, General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2010-11 and fiscal year 2011-12 and fiscal year 2012-13 for the 2011-2013 biennium adjusted for actions approved by the Legislature during the 2011 Session (76th Session) and court decisions.

 

 

 

January 22, 2010, Forecast Report - Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2009-10 and fiscal year 2010-11 for the 2009-2011 biennium.

 

December 1, 2010, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2010-11, and fiscal year 2011-12 and fiscal year 2012-13 for the 2011-2013 biennium.

 

 

 

May 1, 2009, Forecast Report - Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2008-09 and fiscal year 2009-10 and fiscal year 2010-11 for the 2009-2011 biennium.

 

May 1, 2009, Forecast Report Adjusted for Legislative Actions from the 2009 Session - Economic Forum's May 1, 2009 General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2008-09 and fiscal year 2009-10 and fiscal year 2010-11 for the 2009-2011 biennium adjusted for actions approved by the Legislature during the 2009 Session (75th Session).

 

 

 

June 20, 2008, Forecast Report - Revised General Fund revenue forecast for fiscal year 2007-08 and fiscal year 2008-09 for the 2007-09 biennium.

 

December 1, 2008, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2008-09 and fiscal year 2009-10 and fiscal year 2010-11 for the 2009 2011 biennium.

 

 

 

May 1, 2007, Forecast Report – Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2006-07 and fiscal year 2007-08 and fiscal year 2008-09 for the 2007-2009 biennium.

 

 

 

November 1, 2006, Preliminary Forecast Tables – Preliminary General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2006-07 and fiscal year 2007-08 and fiscal year 2008-09 for the 2007-2009 biennium.

 

November 30, 2006, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2006-07 and fiscal year 2007-08 and fiscal year 2008-09 for the 2007-2009 biennium.

 

 

 

May 2, 2005, Forecast Report - Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2004-05 and fiscal year 2005-06 and fiscal year 2006-07 for the 2005-2007 biennium.

 

 

 

November 2, 2004, Preliminary Forecast Tables – Preliminary General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2004-05 and fiscal year 2005-06 and fiscal year 2006-07 for the 2005-2007 biennium.

 

December 1, 2004, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2004-05 and fiscal year 2005-06 and fiscal year 2006-07 for the 2005-2007 biennium.

 

 

 

May 1, 2003, Forecast Report - Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2002-03 and fiscal year 2003-04 and fiscal year 2004-05 for the 2003-2005 biennium.

 

 

 

October 30, 2002, Preliminary Forecast TablesPreliminary General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2002-03 and fiscal year 2003-04 and fiscal year 2004-05 for the 2003-2005 biennium.


December 2, 2002, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2002-03 and fiscal year 2003-04 and fiscal year 2004-05 for the 2003-2005 biennium.

 

 

 

May 1, 2001, Forecast Report Revised General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2000-01 and fiscal year 2001-02 and fiscal year 2002-03 for the 2001-2003 biennium.

 

 

 

December 1, 2000, Forecast Report – General Fund revenue forecasts for fiscal year 2000-01 and fiscal year 2001-02 and fiscal year 2002-03 for the 2001-2003 biennium.

 


Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo