Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
State of the State Address
1864-Current

What we now refer to as the "State of the State Address" or "State of the State Speech" was once referred to more formally as the "Message of the Governor to the Legislature of Nevada," and is required by Article 5, Section 10, of the Constitution of the State of Nevada:

Sec: 10.  Governor's message.  He shall communicate by Message to the Legislature at every regular Session the condition of the State and recommend such measures as he may deem expedient[.]

 
  • Brian E. Sandoval, 2011-Current
  • Robert Joseph "Bob" Miller, 1989-1999
  • Richard Hudson Bryan, 1983-1989
  • Paul Dominique Laxalt, 1967-1971
  • Vail Montgomery Pittman, 1945-1951
    • Acting Governor July 24, 1945, to January 6, 1947
    • 1947
    • 1949
  • Edward Peter Carville, 1939-1945
    • Resigned July 24, 1945; appointed to serve unexpired term of U.S. Senator Scrugham (deceased)
    • 1939
    • 1941
    • 1943
    • 1945
  • Morley Isaac Griswold, 1934-1935
    • Acting Governor March 21, 1934, to January 7, 1935
  • James Graves Scrugham, 1923-1927
  • Tasker Lowndes Oddie, 1911-1915
  • Denver Sylvester Dickerson, 1908-1911
    • Acting Governor May 22, 1908, to January 2, 1911
    • 1909
  • Reinhold Sadler, 1896-1903
  • John Edward Jones, 1895-1896
    • Died April 10, 1896
    • 1895
  • Roswell Keyes Colcord, 1891-1895
  • Frank Bell, 1890-1891
    • Acting Governor September 1, 1890, to January 5, 1891
    • 1891
  • Charles Clark Stevenson, 1887-1890
    • Disability certificate September 1, 1890, died September 21, 1890
    • 1887
    • 1889
  • James Warren Nye, 1861-1864
    • Appointed as Territorial Governor in 1861; Acting Governor of the State of Nevada from October 31, 1864, to December 5, 1864
 
 

 

Sources:  Journal of the Senate, Journal of the Assembly, Appendices to the Journals of Senate and Assembly, Political History of Nevada (2006 ed.), Nevada Governor's Biographical Information

 

Research Library Home

If you have any questions about the Research Division's web pages, please contact the Library.
Last updated 1/17/2013


Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo