Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Video Gallery

Windows Media Player
Get WIndows Media Player
Download Now

All videos require that you have Windows Media Player installed on your computer. You can download and install the latest version of Windows Media Player by clicking here.

Macintosh users must have the latest version of the Windows Media Player, which requires OS X. You may use the Windows Media Components for QuickTime available here.

In order to View Video you must have a 56K connection or better.



Nevada Legislature The Nevada Legislature – The People's Branch of Government  (run time: 21 minutes)
If you are using a MacIntosh and the above link doesn't work, please click here.
If you want to download the video,Windows users right click here and Save Target As to your computer.

Nevada Seal 77th (2013) Session - Departing Legislator Tributes
  • Senate

  • Governor Sandoval January 16, 2013 - Governor Brian Sandoval delivers his State of the State address to the 77th Legislature.

    Democratic Response January 16, 2013 - Senate Majority Floor Leader Mo Denis delivers the Democratic Response to the the 2013 State of the State address.

    Nevada Seal 76th (2011) Session - Departing Legislator Tributes
  • Senate

  • Governor Sandoval January 24, 2011 - Governor Brian Sandoval delivers his State of the State address to the 76th Legislature.

    Speaker Oceguera January 24, 2011 - Speaker of the Assembly John Oceguera delivers the Democratic Response to the 2011 State of the State address.

    Nevada Seal 75th (2009) Session - Departing Legislator Tributes
  • Senate

  • Assembly

  • Governor Gibbons January 15, 2009 - Governor Jim Gibbons delivers his State of the State address to the 75th Legislature.

    Speaker Buckley January 15, 2009 - Speaker of the Assembly Barbara Buckley's response to the the 2009 State of the State address.

    2007 Old Chambers March 20, 2007 - The Assembly Floor Session in the old Assembly Chamber at the Capitol Building.

    Governor Gibbons January 22, 2007 - Governor Jim Gibbons delivers his State of the State address to the 74th Legislature.

    March 22, 2005 - A nostalgic Assembly Floor Session in the old Assembly Chamber at the Capitol Building.
    January 24, 2005 - Governor Kenny Guinn delivers his State of the State address to the 73nd Legislature.

    April 28, 2003 - In a nostalgic ceremony, the Nevada Assembly met Monday in the old Assembly Chamber in the state Capitol Building.
    It was the first Assembly floor session in the old chamber since the separate Legislative Building opened 34 years ago.


    January 20, 2003 - Governor Kenny Guinn delivers his State of the State address to the 72nd Legislature.
     
    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo