2011-2012 Interim
Interim Finance Committee (NRS 218E.400)

Summary 
The Interim Finance Committee functions within the Legislative Counsel Bureau between sessions and administers a contingency fund. The committee is composed of the members of the Senate Committee on Finance and the Assembly Committee on Ways and Means from the preceding session.

Agendas and Minutes

NOTE: The "Current Members" represent the composition of the Interim Finance Committee following the November 6, 2012 election. Senator Debbie Smith will become Chair of the Interim Finance Committee pursuant to subsection 2 of NRS 218E.400 on February 4, 2013. Assemblywoman Maggie Carlton will become Vice Chair of the Interim Finance Committee pursuant to subsection 2 of NRS 218E.400 on February 4, 2013.

June 21, 2012 Meeting

August 23, 2012 Meeting

October 25, 2012 Meeting

December 11, 2012 Meeting

January 25, 2013 Meeting

April 18, 2013 Meeting