2013-2014 Interim
Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice (NRS 176.0123)

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

ABA National Inventory of Collateral Consequences of Conviction

November 6, 2013 Meeting

January 27, 2014 Meeting

Additional Documents

March 5, 2014 Meeting

May 1, 2014 Meeting

July 8, 2014 Meeting

September 12, 2014 Meeting