2013-2014 Interim
Task Force on K-12 Public Education Funding (S.B. 500, 2013)

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

Study of a New Method of Funding for Public Schools in Nevada

New Method for Funding Public Schools Bulletin No. 13-07 January 2013

The Nevada Plan For School Finance

Common Acronyms and Selected Terms for Nevada's Public Education System

January 31, 2014 Meeting

February 28, 2014 Meeting

March 31, 2014 Meeting

May 22, 2014 Meeting

June 30, 2014 Meeting