Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB14
Introduced on Jun 14, 2001
By Joint Rules,
Revises districts for state legislators, state board of education, board of regents and Representatives in Congress. (BDR 17-38)
Fiscal Note
   Effect On Local Government: No.
   Effect on the State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full bill history below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.
 
Hearings
 
Votes
Senate Final Passage   Jun-14   12 Yea , 9 Nay , 0 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
Assembly Final Passage   Jun-14   24 Yea , 17 Nay , 1 Excused , 0 Not Voting , 0 Absent
 
Bill Text (PDF) As Introduced                             As Enrolled    
Bill Text (HTML) As Introduced                             As Enrolled    
Amendments (HTML)

 Bill History

Jun 14, 2001

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee of the Whole. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9). To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1). To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • Jun 15, 2001

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 23.

  • Sections 102 to 107, inclusive, and section 109 effective January 1, 2002. Sections 1 to 66, inclusive, and subsection 1 of section 108 effective January 1, 2002, for the purpose of nominating and electing members of the Nevada Legislature, and on November 6, 2002, for all other purposes. Sections 95 to 101, inclusive, effective January 1, 2002, for the purpose of nominating and electing Representatives in the Congress of the United States, and at 9:00 a.m. January 3, 2003, for all other purposes. Section 67 to 94, inclusive, and subsection 2 of section 108 effective January 1, 2002, for the purpose of nominating and electing members to the state board of education and the board of regents, and on January 7, 2003, for all other purposes.
    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo