Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB518
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing the regulation of telecommunication service. (BDR 58-1128)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 216.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      To Subcommittee .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 05, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes       .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 13, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 469
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 615
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 701

Bill History

Mar 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 469.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 615.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 701 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 216.
  • Effective May 31, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo