Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Veto Messages

Messages from Governor Gibbons regarding 74th Session vetoed bills.

  AB230
May 31, 2007
  AB326
June 2, 2007
  AB364
June 4, 2007
  AB396
June 15, 2007
  AB505*
June 14, 2005  (Message from Governor Guinn)
     
  SB66
May 30, 2007
  SB146
June 15, 2007
  SB274*
June 17, 2005   (Message from Governor Guinn)
  SB567
May 14, 2007