AB566
Introduced in the Assembly on May 06, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1287)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 05, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 564     Amend. No. 609   

Bill History

May 06, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

May 07, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

May 09, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 564.) To printer.

May 10, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 609.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Bill read.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (No further action taken.)