AB511
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Transportation

Revises certain provisions governing transportation. (BDR 43-1109)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 472.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 24, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 07, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 320     Amend. No. 785     Amend. No. 938   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 320.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 785.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 938.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 938 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 472.
  • Sections 12 and 13 of this act effective June 16, 2011. Sections 5 to 7, inclusive, 9, 10, and 11 of this act effective January 1, 2012. Sections 2, 3, 4, and 8 of this act effective March 1, 2012. The following provisions expire by limitation on January 1, 2018: (a) sections 5 to 7, inclusive, of this act; (b) the amendatory provisions of sections 9, 10, and 11 of this act; and (c) subsections 2 and 3 of section 12 of this act.