AB47
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Taxation

Requires a base adjustment in the formula for the allocation of certain consolidated tax revenue and an interim legislative study of the current allocation formula. (BDR S-315)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb 22, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)