AB50
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to the licensure of medical and related health facilities. (BDR 40-445)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 88.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 11, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 10, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 10, 2011

Mar 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

May 17, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 88.
  • Effective January 1, 2012.