AB51
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 14, 2010.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to certain providers of emergency medical services. (BDR 40-447)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 14, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)