AB55
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes relating to dentistry. (BDR 54-498)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 25.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 27, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 04, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 26   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 26.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 04, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 25.
  • Effective May 10, 2011.