SB497
Introduced in the Senate on May 07, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1289)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 10, 2011     01:36 PM          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 07, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

May 09, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 14, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 16, 2011

  • Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.