AB59
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes to the Open Meeting Law. (BDR 19-288)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 383.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Feb 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 01, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 137     Amend. No. 634     Amend. No. CA9   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 137.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 25, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

May 27, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 634 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 634 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
  • To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 634 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 383.
  • Sections 1, 2 to 7, inclusive, and 8 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Section 1.5 of this act effective January 1, 2012.