AB61
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Creates a temporary entity to study issues relating to substance abuse in this State. (BDR 18-290)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 89.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Feb 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 12   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 12.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

May 17, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 89.
  • Effective July 1, 2011, and expires by limitation June 30, 2015.