SB11
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 13, 2010.
By: Finance

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning the development of a new method for funding public schools. (BDR 34-304)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 907   

Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 907.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .

Jun 05, 2011

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 424.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.