AB62
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions relating to the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 18-202)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 90.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 18, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 11, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 53     Amend. No. 471   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 53.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2011

Apr 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 04, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 471.) To printer.

May 05, 2011

May 07, 2011

May 09, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 17, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 471 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 19, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 90.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.