AB2
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 13, 2010.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick, Kirner

Revises provisions relating to emissions testing for certain vehicles. (BDR 43-134)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 275.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 24, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 03, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     Apr 28, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 08, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 29     Amend. No. 776   

Bill History

Dec 13, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 16, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 29.) To printer.

Apr 05, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 776.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 776 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 275.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.