AB69
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Transportation

Authorizes the Department of Transportation to contract with a construction manager at risk for certain projects under certain circumstances. (BDR 35-486)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 15, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 17, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)